MD HB664 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from engaging in the business of making or soliciting a sales-based financing transaction unless the person is licensed by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring an applicant for a license to have $20,000 in available liquid assets and to have demonstrated a sufficient level of responsibility to command public confidence and warrant faith in the honest operation of the business; requiring the Commissioner to investigate and ensure that each applicant meets certain qualifications; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-20HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2021-01-28HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB532 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law13301(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions11610(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121101(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121102(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121103(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121104(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121105(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121106(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121107(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121108(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121109(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121110(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121111(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121112(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121113(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121114(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121115(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121116(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121117(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121118(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121119(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121120(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121121(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121122(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121123(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions121124(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback