MD HB664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Nonprofit Youth Development Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to qualifying nonprofit organizations whose mission and programs target at-risk youth using certain strategies; requiring that funds for the Program be provided in the annual State budget; requiring the State Superintendent to review certain applications, award grants meeting certain criteria, and give priority for grants to organizations serving areas with high concentrations of at-risk youth living in poverty; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795063/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Communications
Corporations
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
Forms
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Youth
Baltimore City
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Communications
Corporations
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
Forms
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
Youth