MD HB661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB360
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Notary Public Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding to support the Secretary of State in the implementation, regulation, and enforcement of certain actions; requiring the Secretary of State to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of State to distribute certain fees to the Fund: etc.
Title
State Government - Notaries Public - Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budgets
Comptroller
Fees
Investments
Notaries Public
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Comptroller
Fees
Investments
Notaries Public
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Treasurers
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 18 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 18 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 18 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |