MD SB360 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB661

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Notary Public Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding to support the Secretary of State in the implementation, regulation, and enforcement of certain actions; requiring the Secretary of State to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of State to distribute certain fees to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-26HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-24HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-22SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-01-18SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB661 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18103(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18108(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback