MD HB660 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program to offer certain low cost insurance policies to residents of Baltimore City and Prince George's County who are in households with a gross annual household income not exceeding 300% of the federal poverty level and who meet certain other requirements; providing that the Program is part of the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund; requiring the Program, on receipt of a certain premium, to sell, issue, and deliver policies of automobile insurance to certain individuals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseReferred to interim study by Economic Matters
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB934 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance20301(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A10(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A6(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A7(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A8(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance20-6A9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback