MD HB657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of at least $100,000 for a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Arts Education in Maryland Schools Alliance for the development, implementation, and maintenance of the Artlook Map Maryland Project; and providing that the grant is in addition to and may not supplant funds otherwise granted to the Arts Education in Maryland Schools Alliance.
Title
Arts Education in Maryland Schools Alliance Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 680 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {394366/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Curriculum
Education
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sunset
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Curriculum
Education
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sunset