MD HB657 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a statewide kindergarten assessment to be limited to a representative sample of kindergarten students from within each local school system in the State, subject to a specified exception; authorizing a specified kindergarten assessment to evaluate specified skills; authorizing specified county boards of education and specified principals and teachers to administer a specified statewide kindergarten assessment if the assessment is completed by October 1 and the aggregate results are returned within 45 days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateSenators Pinsky, Waugh, and Conway
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2016-04-08HouseDelegates Kaiser, Hornberger, and A. Washington
2016-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-08HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2016-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2016-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {584137/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {725168/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-02-18HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0657&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0657f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0657t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0657e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_273_hb0657e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0657_72516801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0657_58413701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0657_60352001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0657_54302201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0657.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0657_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0657_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0657_54302201.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0657,h-0545&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0657,s-1012&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0657,h-1454&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0657,s-1385&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback