MD HB648 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified modifications to the State income tax credit for the expense of registering specified qualified vehicles in the State; requiring a taxpayer to obtain a tax credit certificate from the Motor Vehicle Administration to receive the credit; limiting to $10,000 the aggregate amount of tax credit certificates the Administration may issue to any one taxpayer and to $500,000 to all taxpayers in a taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Special Order until 4/07 (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {205363/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Income Tax
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Income Tax
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income