MD HB647 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the award of an additional video lottery operation license for a facility in Charles County in a vessel on the Potomac River; specifying that specified proceeds from video lottery terminals and table games at the facility be paid to the Governor Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge Fund; exempting the Fund from a specified provision of law requiring interest earnings on State money in special funds to accrue to the General Fund of the State; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback