MD HB64 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring employers operating construction sites in the State to provide an adequate handwashing facility on the construction sites; requiring that the handwashing facilities include potable water, be in an accessible location, be adequate for the number of workers, and be maintained in a clean and sanitary condition; requiring the employers to allow workers on the construction sites to have reasonable access to the handwashing facilities during the workday; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Handwashing Facilities on Construction Sites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-18HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment5609(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback