MD HB637 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the grounds on which a deputy sheriff having a rank of major or below in Washington County may be discharged after 2 years of continuous employment; providing that a special deputy sheriff in Washington County is not a State employee for certain purposes; authorizing sworn deputy sheriffs at the rank of sergeant and below and correctional deputies at the rank of sergeant and below to engage in collective bargaining with the Washington County Sheriff and the County Administrator; etc.
Title
Washington County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Deputies - Employment Conditions and Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Subjects
Arbitration
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Officers
County Administrators
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Petitions
Police Conduct
Sheriffs
Strikes
Termination of Employment
Unions
Washington County
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Correctional Officers
County Administrators
County Commissioners
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Petitions
Police Conduct
Sheriffs
Strikes
Termination of Employment
Unions
Washington County
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |