MD HB615 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB233
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on each Sunday of the deer hunting seasons in Prince George's County from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January, inclusive; and adding Prince George's County to the list of counties in which the safety zone for archery hunters extends 50 yards from a dwelling house, residence, church, or any other building or camp occupied by human beings.
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-12) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {640715/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB615 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Animals
Anne Arundel County
Calvert County
Camps
Carroll County
Cecil County
Frederick County
Harford County
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Montgomery County
Natural Resources, Department of
Places of Worship
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Residential Property
Safety
St. Mary's County
Time
Washington County
Weights and Measures
Anne Arundel County
Calvert County
Camps
Carroll County
Cecil County
Frederick County
Harford County
Housing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Montgomery County
Natural Resources, Department of
Places of Worship
Prince George's County
Private Schools
Public Schools
Residential Property
Safety
St. Mary's County
Time
Washington County
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |