MD HB61 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB308
Note: Carry Foward to future HB814
Note: Carry Foward to future HB814
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish and administer a statewide green business certification program; requiring the green business certification program to recognize businesses operating in a way that reduces their environmental footprint and to provide consumers with information on how to identify those businesses; requiring the Department to update and enhance the statewide green business certification program in consultation with the Montgomery County Green Business Certification Program; etc.
Title
Environment – Statewide Green Business Certification Program – Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB61 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB61 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB61 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Montgomery County
Rules and Regulations
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Montgomery County
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |