MD HB61 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Brain Injury Trust Fund as a special fund used to support specified services for individuals with brain injuries; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene or the Secretary's designee to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to make specified reports; establishing eligibility for individuals to receive assistance from the Fund; requiring that specified investment earnings be credited to the Fund; requiring a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
State Brain Injury Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606788/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Motor Vehicle Registration
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Motor Vehicle Registration
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration