MD HB606 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified conditions of eligibility for funding from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account by specifying minimum amounts to be spent on capital maintenance and expenditures by specified race tracks; authorizing the Maryland Racing Commission to grant a one-time request for capital improvement funds not to exceed $150,000 from the funds available in the Account for a capital improvement project at the Bowie Race Course Training Center under specified conditions; etc.
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695266/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Condemnation
Contracts
Horse Racing
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Information
Public Officials
Racing
Real Property
Contracts
Horse Racing
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Information
Public Officials
Racing
Real Property