MD HB596 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Entering into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to strengthen access to health care by developing a process to complement existing licensing authority and provide a streamlined method for physicians to be licensed in multiple states; requiring a physician to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive an initial expedited license; establishing an Interstate Commission to administer the Compact and develop certain rules; establishing requirements for certain disciplinary actions; etc.
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {336985/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Assessments
Bonds
Budgets
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Copyright
Courts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Disclosure
District of Columbia
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Grants
Health Occupations
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Notices
Personal Property
Physicians
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Torts
Work, Labor and Employment
Appeals
Assessments
Bonds
Budgets
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Copyright
Courts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Disclosure
District of Columbia
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Fees
Gifts
Grants
Health Occupations
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Notices
Personal Property
Physicians
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Real Estate
Real Property
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Torts
Work, Labor and Employment