MD HB595 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the student member of the Baltimore County Board of Education to vote on matters relating to capital and operating budgets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateMotion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (114-17)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education32B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback