MD HB589 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to enter into a contract with an independent auditor as soon as practicable to conduct an audit of certain pharmacy benefits managers for the purpose of determining the amount of Medicaid funds used to reimburse managed care organization, pharmacy benefits managers, and pharmacies and the dollar amount of funds received by each respective party; requiring the Program to provide the results of the audit to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Audit and Professional Dispensing Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {676183/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Contracts
Data
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Contracts
Data
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset