MD HB588 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing access to specified court records and police records by the Baltimore City Health Department's Office of Youth Violence Prevention and the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice under specified circumstances; requiring that the Baltimore City Health Department's Office of Youth Violence Prevention and the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice be liable for the unauthorized release of specified records and information; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582919/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Child Abuse and Neglect
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Health
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Privacy
Records
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Victims
Violence
Baltimore City
Child Abuse and Neglect
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Health
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Privacy
Records
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Victims
Violence