MD HB585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Baltimore County to pay Orphans' Court judges, if the judge was in office on or after January 1, 2022, and their surviving spouses a certain pension under certain circumstances; and requiring the County Council of Baltimore County to establish, by law, certain requirements and procedures relating to the pension of a judge of the Orphans' Court.
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges and Surviving Spouses - Pensions
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903220/1 (Senator Sydnor) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-1) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Subjects
Baltimore County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Orphans' Court
Retirement
Spouses
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Orphans' Court
Retirement
Spouses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |