MD HB584 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from prohibiting the construction or operation of multiple net metered solar generating facilities located on contiguous lots that are owned by a local government solely because the capacity of the combined net metering systems exceeds the 2 megawatt limit under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities – Net Energy Metering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-04-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2021-04-02SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (93-40)
2021-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {143297/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-01-20HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB508 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-02 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7306(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback