MD HB579 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to enter on specified real property, the common area of a specified multifamily building, or a specified commercial building at reasonable times to post a notice on or near the entry door of the building or unit under specified circumstances.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Notices
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-02 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Notices
Sewage
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Construction
Notices
Sewage
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water