MD HB577 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a county employee who serves as an election judge during hours that the employee is scheduled to work for the county receive certain administrative leave and certain election judge compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – County Employee Service as Election Judge – Administrative Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-5)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {195461/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback