MD HB576 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-11)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing each county to establish an assisted outpatient treatment program by July 1, 2026; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish an assisted outpatient treatment program in a county that does not opt to establish the program by July 1, 2026; requiring the Office of the Public Defender to provide representation in assisted outpatient treatment proceedings; etc.
Title
Mental Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113623/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {493424/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB453 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advance Medical Directives
Age of Majority
Attorneys
Counties
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Evidence
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Hospitals
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Nurse Practitioners
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
studies
Threats
Violence
Advance Medical Directives
Age of Majority
Attorneys
Counties
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Demographics
Emergency Medical Services
Ethics
Evidence
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Hospitals
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Nurse Practitioners
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Safety
studies
Threats
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 16 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10-6A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |