MD HB57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each manager and supervisor in the Legislative and Executive branches of State government to immediately report to the appointing authority or head of the principal unit certain incidents of workplace bullying; providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly to educate all employees about bullying, ensure that bullying is not tolerated, and deal appropriately with bullying in the workplace; requiring certain human resources departments to collect and share data on complaints and reports; etc.
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn |
2019-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Abuse
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Attorneys
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Discrimination
Elderly Persons
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Gender
General Assembly
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Libel and Slander
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Places of Worship
Privacy
Records
Religion
Reparations
Reports
Restitution
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Personnel
Threats
Victims
Violence
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Appeals
Attorneys
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Discrimination
Elderly Persons
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Gender
General Assembly
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Libel and Slander
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Places of Worship
Privacy
Records
Religion
Reparations
Reports
Restitution
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Personnel
Threats
Victims
Violence
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment