MD HB569 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum amount of cash contributions a person may make to campaign finance entities to $100 in a calendar year; making clarifying changes; and providing for a delayed effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance - Cash Contributions - Limit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-14HouseHearing cancelled
2014-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback