MD HB568 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each correctional facility to disseminate certain written information directly to each eligible voter regarding voter registration, absentee voting, and certain applications and provide an absentee ballot to an eligible voter on request; requiring the Board of Elections to provide correctional facilities with certain written materials; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide each individual who is released from a facility with a voter registration application; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (93-36)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {895162/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB372 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services2502(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback