MD HB222 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB568

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide each individual who is released from a correctional facility with a voter registration application and documentation informing the individual that their voting rights have been restored; requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations establishing a program to inform eligible voters of upcoming elections and how to exercise the right to vote; requiring the State Board to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by January 15 each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration and Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 733327/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 85 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (98-41)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (34-11)
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {794337/1 Adopted
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (95-39)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {733327/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-85)
2021-03-20HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {705061/1 Adopted
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
2020-11-01HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB568 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
SB224 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law1303.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0222?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0222f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0222t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0222e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0222_70506101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0222_73332701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0222_79433701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0222_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0222_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0222_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0681.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0693.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1137.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1425.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback