MD HB566 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a police officer from arresting a person for the offense of driving or allowing another person to drive a motor vehicle that is not covered by the required security if the person provides documentary evidence that the required security is in effect; prohibiting a police officer from impounding a vehicle in specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lapsed Security - Restriction on Arrest and Impoundment of
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] |
Sen. Wayne Norman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | Re-assigned Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0566.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0566f.pdf |