MD HB561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of the Baltimore City Police Department to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the financial management practices of the Department beginning July 1, 2019, and at least once every 6 years thereafter; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to provide certain information to the Baltimore City Police Department.
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
General Assembly
Law Enforcement
State Government - General Assembly
Time
Baltimore City
General Assembly
Law Enforcement
State Government - General Assembly
Time