MD HB56 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing out-of-state motor home or recreational trailer dealers that are licensed by the licensing authority of another state to display motor homes and recreational vehicles at vehicle shows; and
requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study on the perceivable impact of out-of-state dealers of motor homes or recreational trailers displaying or exhibiting at vehicle shows in the State on the Maryland RV Show at the Maryland State Fairgrounds and report its findings by December 1, 2026.
Title
Motor Home and Recreational Trailer Shows - Out-of-State Dealers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-5) |
2024-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503729/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB60 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-23 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Conventions
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
studies
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Worcester County
Commerce, Department of
Conventions
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
studies
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Worcester County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 15 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |