MD HB56 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment; and requiring, on or before July 1, 2023 and December 1, 2023, the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education, and the General Assembly.
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB377 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Ethnic Affairs
General Assembly
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Nurses
Psychologists
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
School Administration
Social Workers
Students
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Ethnic Affairs
General Assembly
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Nurses
Psychologists
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
School Administration
Social Workers
Students
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0056?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0056f.pdf |