MD HB377 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1443

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment; requiring the Commission to study certain matters regarding student behavioral health and mental health treatment and make recommendations on actions necessary to improve current student behavioral health practices and programs; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-09-22HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

HB1443 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback