MD HB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing employees of certain employers to use certain leave with pay for bereavement leave; defining the term "bereavement leave" as leave an employee is allowed to use on the death of a member of the employee's immediate family; and defining the term "child" for purposes of certain bereavement leave to include an adopted, biological, or foster child, a stepchild, or a legal ward.
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-37) |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-06-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Death
dependents
Foster Care
Leave
Minors
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor, and Employment
Death
dependents
Foster Care
Leave
Minors
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |