MD HB556 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB225
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt during a certain time period on certain Sundays of the game bird and game mammal seasons in Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County.
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-9) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {703222/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543928/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-13) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753029/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB342 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB225 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB225 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Blue Laws
Caroline County
Dorchester County
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Queen Anne's County
Time
Caroline County
Dorchester County
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Queen Anne's County
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |