MD HB225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person in Queen Anne's County to hunt any game bird or game mammal on a Sunday during the open season for that game bird or game mammal.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-6) |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB225 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB605 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
SB605 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |