MD HB556 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified providers to set aside operating reserves that, before January 1, 2023, equal 15% of specified expenses of a facility; requiring specified providers to set aside operating reserves that, beginning on January 1, 2023, equal 25% of specified expenses of a facility; beginning January 1, 2014, providing for the manner in which specified requirements relating to assets held by providers shall be met; etc.
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments 876181/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Budgets
Consumer Protection
Continuing Care
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Mediation
Records
Reports
Aging, Department of
Assisted Living
Budgets
Consumer Protection
Continuing Care
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Mediation
Records
Reports