MD HB549 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that a certain person enter certain information on the forms provided by the Secretary of Health and attach a certain order to the forms; requiring the Division of Vital Records to immediately take certain actions on receipt of certain documents; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB215 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Court Orders
Courts
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Registration
State Documents
Vital Records
Women
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Court Orders
Courts
Forms
Health
Health, Department of
Identification
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Registration
State Documents
Vital Records
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |