MD SB215 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1062

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that a certain person enter certain information on the forms provided by the Secretary of Health and attach a certain order to the forms; requiring the Division of Vital Records to immediately take certain actions on receipt of certain documents; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-05SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB1062 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations
HB549 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General4208(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General4226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback