MD HB548 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Community Investment Venture Fund as an instrumentality of the State for purposes of developing opportunities for banking institutions and credit unions to better serve the needs of low- to moderate-income tracts; providing for certain assessment offset credits for certain banking institutions and credit unions in certain areas; authorizing the use of the Banking Institution and Credit Union Regulation Fund for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Financial Regulation - Maryland Community Investment Venture Fund - Establishment (Access to Banking Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-38) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {283026/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-38) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {913424/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB550 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Credit Unions
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Investments
Low-Income
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Community Development
Credit Unions
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Investments
Low-Income
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 2 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 2 | 118.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 5 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 6 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |