MD HB546 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing special elections in Montgomery County to be conducted by voting by mail; applying specified provisions of law to ballots used for voting by mail in Montgomery County; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations to govern voting by mail; requiring specified regulations to provide for specified elements regarding voting by mail; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2011-02-21 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-08 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0546.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0546f.pdf |