MD HB543 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on a Sunday on private property from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January of the following year, inclusive, in Carroll County, subject to specified provisions of law.
Title
Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-10) (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-10) (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-10) |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {700716/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |