MD HB542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Services to establish and maintain a decentralized supply of new luggage to be used to transport the personal belongings of a child in foster care; requiring the Department to provide new luggage to a child in foster care who is entering foster care, moving from one placement to another, or exiting foster care; prohibiting the Department from using disposable bags or trash bags to transport a child's belongings; and requiring the Department to maintain certain records.
Title
Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473721/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB668 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Age
Children
Family Law
Foster Care
Gifts
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Personal Property
Records
Reports
Storage
Transportation
Age
Children
Family Law
Foster Care
Gifts
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Personal Property
Records
Reports
Storage
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 505.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |