MD HB532 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to develop a certain blueprint to guide units of State and local government in evaluating proposed solar energy projects; requiring the Commission submit a certain report and blueprint to Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback