MD HB531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement for the Maryland Parole Commission to assess a fee against an individual on parole and supervised by the Division of Parole and Probation under certain circumstances; and repealing authorization for the Division of Parole and Probation to require a supervisee of the Division who is on parole to pay for certain drug or alcohol abuse testing under certain circumstances.
Title
Correctional Services – Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment – Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-8) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-26) |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB728 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 7 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |