MD HB526 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from providing, attempting to provide, or offering to provide certain plumbing services in any area under the regulatory jurisdiction of the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission without a license from the Commission; prohibiting a person from assisting, attempting to assist, or offering to assist in providing certain fuel gas services in any area under the regulatory jurisdiction of the Commission without a license from the Commission; establishing a certain penalty for certain violations; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Plumbing and Fuel Gas Services - Licenses and Penalties PG/MC 109-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-15) |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Equipment
Fraud
Fuel
Licenses
Montgomery County
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Plumbing
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Unfair Trade Practices
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Equipment
Fraud
Fuel
Licenses
Montgomery County
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Plumbing
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Unfair Trade Practices
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 29 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 29 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |