MD HB526 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person, subject to certain limitations, to directly or indirectly advertise for or solicit business in the State for a diagnostic laboratory test or procedure ordered by a physician and performed by a medical laboratory that is certified under 42 U.S.C. ยง 263a; requiring a certain person to disclose that a certain laboratory test may or may not be covered by insurance; authorizing the Secretary of Health to take legal action to restrict the marketing of a diagnostic laboratory test under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {146186/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback