MD HB525 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB376
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program in the State Department of Education to license outdoor, nature-based early learning and child care programs to expand access to affordable, high-quality early learning and child care programs and investigate the benefits of outdoor, nature-based classrooms; requiring the Department to submit a final report to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2027, with recommendations for modifying or expanding the Program; etc.
Title
Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463621/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB376 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Child Care
Children
Curriculum
Education, State Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources
Pilot Programs
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Sunset
Time
Urban Areas
Child Care
Children
Curriculum
Education, State Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources
Pilot Programs
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Sunset
Time
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 9.5 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.5 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.5 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.5 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |