MD HB519 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction during the marriage of the child's mother with the consent of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses for all purposes; providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction after the death of the mother's spouse and using the genetic material of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Parentage and Adoption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-6)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {273127/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateMotion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (31-14)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {708576/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (130-4)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {472419/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0519&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0519f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0519t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0519e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0519_47241901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0519_70857601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0519_27312701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0519.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0519_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0519_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0767.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0519_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1066.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1070.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1273.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback