MD HB517 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding conspiracy to distribute specified narcotic drugs and the commission of a specified crime in another state as predicates for an enhanced penalty for offenses relating to narcotic drugs.
Title
Criminal Law - Narcotic Drugs - Enhanced Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Kevin Kelly [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Del. Luiz Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Special Order later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Special Order 4/12 (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Judiciary |